High School Maths Examples and Questions

to top menu   
go backback
   
to searchsearch
   to Numbers   

Questions − Long Multiplication, Traditional Method

1.  23 × 97 =

2.  475 × 88 =

3.  576 × 72 =

4.  1,783 × 37 =

5.  684 × 47 =

6.  786 × 77 =




to top menu   
go backback
   
to searchsearch
   back to:  examples  to:  answers