High School Maths Examples and Questions

to top menu   
go backback
   
to searchsearch
   to Numbers   

Answers − Long Multiplication − Traditional method

1.    23 × 97 =

(a) write the multiplication as follows:

23
×    97
-------
(b) multiply 23 by 7:
23
×    97
-------
161
(c) multiply 23 by 90:
23
×    97
-------
161
2070
-------
(d) add the two resulting rows:
23
×    97
-------
161
+2070
-------
2231

2.    475 × 88 =

(a) write the multiplication as follows:

475
×    88
-------
(b) multiply 475 by 8:
475
×    88
-------
3800
(c) multiply 475 by 80:
475
×    80
-------
3800
38000
-------
(d) add the two resulting rows:
475
×    88
-------
3800
+38000
-------
41800

3.    576 × 72 =

(a) write the multiplication as follows:

576
×    72
-------
(b) multiply 576 by 2:
576
×    72
-------
1152
(c) multiply 576 by 70:
576
×    72
-------
1152
40320
-------
(d) add the two resulting rows:
576
×    72
-------
1152
+40320
-------
41472

4.    1783 × 37 =

(a) write the multiplication as follows:

1783
×    37
-------
(b) multiply 1783 by 7:
1783
×    37
-------
12481
(c) multiply 1783 by 30:
1783
×    37
-------
12481
53490
-------
(d) add the two resulting rows:
1783
×    37
-------
12481
+53490
-------
65971

5.    684 × 47 =

(a) write the multiplication as follows:

684
×    47
-------
(b) multiply 684 by 7:
684
×    47
-------
4788
(c) multiply 684 by 40:
684
×    47
-------
4788
27360
-------
(d) add the two resulting rows:
684
×    47
-------
4788
+27360
-------
32148

6.    786 × 77 =

(a) write the multiplication as follows:

786
×    77
-------
(b) multiply 786 by 7:
786
×    77
-------
5502
(c) multiply 786 by 70:
786
×    77
-------
5502
55020
-------
(d) add the two resulting rows:
786
×    77
-------
5502
+55020
-------
60522

to top menu   
go backback
   
to searchsearch
   back to:   examples    questions