High School Maths Examples and Questions

to top menu   
go backback
   
to searchsearch
   to Numbers   

Answers − Long Multiplication − Box Method

1.    23 × 97 =

(a) create a table: with 20 and 3 in the first row; and 90 and 7 in the first column

(b) complete the remaining cells by multiplying as follows:

  
× 20 3
90 1800270
7 14021

(c) add up all the values that were multiplied in second step above:

1800
270
140
+    21
-------
2231

2.    475 × 88 =

(a) create a table: with 400, 70 and 5 in the first row; and 80 and 8 in the first column

(b) complete the remaining cells by multiplying as follows:

  
× 400 70 5
80 320005600400
8 3200560 40

(c) add up all the values that were multiplied in second step above:

32000
5600
400
3200
560
+    40
-------
41800

3.    576 × 72 =

(a) create a table: with 500, 70 and 6 in the first row; and 70 and 2 in the first column

(b) complete the remaining cells by multiplying as follows:

  
× 500 70 6
70 350004900420
2 1000140 12

(c) add up all the values that were multiplied in second step above:

35000
4900
420
1000
140
+    12
-------
41472

4.    1783 × 37 =

(a) create a table: with 1000, 700, 80 and 3 in the first row; and 30 and 7 in the first column

(b) complete the remaining cells by multiplying as follows:

  
× 1000 700 80 3
30 3000021000 2400 90
7 70004900 560 21

(c) add up all the values that were multiplied in second step above:

30000
21000
2400
90
7000
4900
560
+    21
-------
65971

5.    684 × 47 =

(a) create a table: with 600, 80 and 4 in the first row; and 40 and 7 in the first column

(b) complete the remaining cells by multiplying as follows:

  
× 600 80 4
40 240003200160
7 4200560 28

(c) add up all the values that were multiplied in second step above:

24000
3200
160
4200
560
+    28
-------
32148

6.    786 × 77 =

(a) create a table: with 700, 80 and 6 in the first row; and 70 and 7 in the first column

(b) complete the remaining cells by multiplying as follows:

  
× 700 80 6
70 490005600420
7 4900560 42

(c) add up all the values that were multiplied in second step above:

49000
5600
420
4900
560
+    42
-------
60522

to top menu   
go backback
   
to searchsearch
   back to:   examples    questions